This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2023 at 20:03:37 (UTC).

SYLVIA GATES CARLISLE VS BEAVER MEDICAL GROUP, P.C., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 SYLVIA GATES CARLISLE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEAVER MEDICAL GROUP, P C , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7821

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GATES CARLISLE SYLVIA

Defendants

CHAN RAYMOND

BEAVER MEDICAL GROUP P.C.

EPIC MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

OPTUM INC.

UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLEAVER GEORGE

Defendant Attorney

BROPHY JONATHAN L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2024
  • Hearing07/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2024
  • Hearing07/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (10-14 day estimate) scheduled for 07/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 04/10/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Sylvia Gates Carlisle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Beaver Medical Group, P.C. (Defendant); Optum, Inc. (Defendant); UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Defendant); EPIC Management Services, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Sylvia Gates Carlisle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Beaver Medical Group, P.C. (Defendant); Optum, Inc. (Defendant); UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Defendant); EPIC Management Services, LLC (Defendant); As to: Sylvia Gates Carlisle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sylvia Gates Carlisle (Plaintiff); As to: Beaver Medical Group, P.C., a California corporation (Defendant); Optum, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); UnitedHealth Group, Inc., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 17 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sylvia Gates Carlisle (Plaintiff); As to: Beaver Medical Group, P.C., a California corporation (Defendant); Optum, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); UnitedHealth Group, Inc., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sylvia Gates Carlisle (Plaintiff); As to: Beaver Medical Group, P.C., a California corporation (Defendant); Optum, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); UnitedHealth Group, Inc., a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less