This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 08:15:31 (UTC).

SYLVIA BOCK VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 SYLVIA BOCK filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA MONICA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0006

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOCK SYLVIA

Defendants

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

SERENITY NOW MASSAGE INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

POST INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAPERSTEIN LISA

Defendant Attorney

BROWN SAMANTHA STORY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/5/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

1/5/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/6/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/3/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Demand for Jury Trial

3/1/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

3/1/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • Hearing07/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: POST INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Name Extension: (1st)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant); POST INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant); POST INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: SERENITY NOW MASSAGE INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 01/12/2023; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); SERENITY NOW MASSAGE INC. (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); SERENITY NOW MASSAGE INC. (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); SERENITY NOW MASSAGE INC. (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: SYLVIA BOCK (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); SERENITY NOW MASSAGE INC. (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less