This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 00:09:51 (UTC).

SYI LIN SU VS CAROL ALDA MA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 SYI LIN SU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CAROL ALDA MA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0668

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SU SYI LIN

Defendants

MA CAROL ALDA

CATHAY BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TAM JAMES

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

3/1/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

2/14/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/21/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

11/15/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/26/2018: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/19/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment

10/4/2018: Notice of Case Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/4/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

10/4/2018: Summons

Complaint

10/4/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by SYI LIN SU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by SYI LIN SU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by CAROL ALDA MA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by SYI LIN SU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Answer; Filed by CAROL ALDA MA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by SYI LIN SU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by SYI LIN SU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAM JAMES