This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2019 at 09:05:36 (UTC).

SYED AHMAD ET AL VS CITY OF TORRANCE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/27/2018 SYED AHMAD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF TORRANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9473

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AHMAD SYED

AHMAD TOSHIE

Defendants

RAMIREZ FRANK

CITY OF TORRANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH PIUS ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

THOMPSON-BELL DELLA D.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES

3/27/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES

SUMMONS -

3/27/2018: SUMMONS -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/13/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/13/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

12/6/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONF...)

12/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONF...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • Hearing03/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Hearing04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Hearing04/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( To Continue Final Status Conference and Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Final Status Conf...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (To Continue Final Status Conference and Trial); Filed by Syed Ahmad (Plaintiff); Toshie Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Clerical Error

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Torrance (Defendant); Frank Ramirez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Syed Ahmad (Plaintiff); Toshie Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON-BELL DELLA D.