This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 09:35:28 (UTC).

SWEET LEMONS, LLC VS WORLD OF DANCE TOUR INC.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 SWEET LEMONS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WORLD OF DANCE TOUR INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8584

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWEET LEMONS LLC

Defendant

WORLD OF DANCE TOUR INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER MARTIN D.

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF AMIR M. KAHANA P.C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/2/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (with prejudice - as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action); Filed by SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE - AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (JOINT - FOR PLAINTIFF SWEET LEMONS LLC TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • Declaration (OF DEMURRER PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by WORLD OF DANCE TOUR INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by WORLD OF DANCE TOUR INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Proof of Service (OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND ACCOMPANYING DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANT WORLD OF DANCE TOUR INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by SWEET LEMONS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLD OF DANCE TOUR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINGER MARTIN D.