This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 01:27:13 (UTC).

SVETLANA SAMSONOVA, ET AL. VS HD RENTALS, INC. , ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 SVETLANA SAMSONOVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HD RENTALS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3259

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAMSONOVA SVETLANA

GRCEVIC DAVOR

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION

HD RENTALS INC. DBA CMC PARTY RENTALS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEVERINO CEDRIC

Defendant Attorney

YANG REY SHUNG

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

11/13/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

11/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/17/2020

11/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/17/2020

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/6/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/13/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/4/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

5/19/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/14/2020: PI General Order

Request for Dismissal

4/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/3/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Svetlana Samsonova (Plaintiff); Davor Grcevic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 11/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by HD Rentals, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Svetlana Samsonova (Plaintiff); Davor Grcevic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Cedric Severino (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by HD Rentals, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Svetlana Samsonova (Plaintiff); Davor Grcevic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance, a Massachusetts Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Davor Grcevic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Svetlana Samsonova (Plaintiff); Davor Grcevic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Svetlana Samsonova (Plaintiff); Davor Grcevic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Svetlana Samsonova (Plaintiff); Davor Grcevic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Svetlana Samsonova (Plaintiff); Davor Grcevic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Svetlana Samsonova (Plaintiff); Davor Grcevic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEVERINO CEDRIC