This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 05:33:09 (UTC).

SVETLANA GUREVICH VS TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/10/2018 SVETLANA GUREVICH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TRADER JOE'S COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1843

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GUREVICH SVETLANA

Defendants and Respondents

TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KHORSHIDI OMID ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BEAN HEATHER M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2018: Proof of Personal Service

DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ETC

6/22/2018: DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ETC

Opposition

7/9/2018: Opposition

DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S REPLY TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/16/2018: DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S REPLY TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/23/2018: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

7/23/2018: ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT TRADER JOES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

7/30/2018: DEFENDANT TRADER JOES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Informal Discovery Conference

11/1/2018: Informal Discovery Conference

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/23/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/23/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order

1/23/2019: Minute Order

Notice

5/1/2019: Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

4/10/2018: Summons

Complaint

4/10/2018: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel for Plaintiff); Filed by Svetlana Gurevich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts (- Response); Filed by Trader Joe's Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts (- Not Resolved); Filed by Svetlana Gurevich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Informal Discovery Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Trader Joe's Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DEFENDANT TRADER JOES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER; Overruled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • Opposition Pl's Opposition to Def's Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Opposition Document; Filed by Svetlana Gurevich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Demurrer; Filed by Trader Joe's Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Svetlana Gurevich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Svetlana Gurevich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Svetlana Gurevich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet /Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701843    Hearing Date: September 02, 2020    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING:

GUREVIC V TRADER JOE’S BC701843

9/2/20

1. PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED 3/4/20:

GRANTED. The court orders that the deposition of the plaintiff’s minor son, Alexander Gurevich, not a party to this case and who was 9 years old at the time of the incident (over 3 years ago), is unlikely to result in the discovery of admissible evidence or evidence that could lead to admissible evidence, that in consideration of his minority, it would not be in anyone’s best interest to force him to testify now or at trial, that there will be no prejudice to anyone from not having him testify. However, this would be conditioned on the following: that plaintiff and her counsel cannot mention or discuss her son at any time during trial in front of the jury and that her son will not appear in court (even as a visitor) for any trial or pre-trial or post-trial proceedings, and that this order will not be mentioned in front of the jury by anyone. The court also notes the young age of the minor at the time of the event, the long time which has passed since then, the ongoing stress of COVID shutdowns and shelters, all of which may combine to make the deposition more stressful given the very low probability of obtaining any relevant information.

2. DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED 2/3/20:

GRANT/DENY. If Felix Rodriguez is not a management level employee, then granted as to Mr. Rodriguez. If he was a management level employee on the day of the incident, then denied.

DENIED as to Christian Ovalle, Christian Chavez, Concepcion Lorente and Luz Nelson. The number of people to be deposed is not dispositive. The issue is whether the employees who worked the same day prior to the incident may have relevant information about liquid on the floor, cleaning procedures, prior incidents, sweep sheets, water leakage from equipment, etc. etc. This is especially true when it is directly relevant to the case as to whether there was notice, what the cleaning procedure was on that date, and things of that nature.

3. MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS FILED 3/10/20 OF LORENTE, RODRIQUEZ, NELSON, OVALLE, CHAVEZ

GRANT. Depositions of these employees is allowed because of the broad scope of discovery and the relevant information they may have concerning the events of that day prior to the incident.  Depositions to take place within the next 45 days on mutually convenient dates and times.

4. SANCTIONS

DENY. No sanctions are awarded. The court finds that the refusal to engage in discovery/motions for protective orders/motions to compel were all based on a good faith discovery dispute and was not done for misuse of discovery.