This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 04:27:21 (UTC).

SUZETTE VEGA VS MICHAEL J TINSLEY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2017 SUZETTE VEGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL J TINSLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0169

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

VEGA SUZETTE

Respondents and Defendants

TINSLEY MICHAEL J.

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

GEOULLA DANIEL D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CHIRINIAN GUY ESQ.

GALANG BRITTON P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/20/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Ex Parte Application

12/4/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE CONTINUANCE OF FSC AND TRIAL DATES

8/3/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE CONTINUANCE OF FSC AND TRIAL DATES

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY CENTRAL DISTRICT

7/12/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY CENTRAL DISTRICT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF SUZETTE VEGA

1/31/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF SUZETTE VEGA

Unknown

1/31/2018: Unknown

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/31/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Michael J. Tinsley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application (and notice of motion and motion to continue trial); Filed by Michael J. Tinsley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE CONTINUANCE OF FSC AND TRIAL DATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY CENTRAL DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Suzette Vega (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF SUZETTE VEGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Michael J. Tinsley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Michael J. Tinsley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael J. Tinsley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Suzette Vega (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Suzette Vega (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0169    Hearing Date: March 10, 2020    Dept: 32

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

suzette vega,

Plaintiff,

v.

michael j. tinsley,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****0169

Hearing Date: March 5, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

defendant’S Motion to compel compliance with subpoena

Defendant Michael J. Tinskley (“Defendant”) moves to compel third party State Farm General Insurance Company (“Deponent”) to comply with a deposition subpoena. Code of Civil Procedure ; 1987.1 provides, “[i]f a subpoena requires the attendance of a witness or the production of books, documents, electronically stored information, or other things before a court, or at the trial of an issue therein, or at the taking of a deposition, the court, upon motion . . . may make an order quashing the subpoena entirely, modifying it, or directing compliance with it upon those terms or conditions as the court shall declare, including protective orders.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 1987.1.)

Defendant personally served Deponent with a subpoena. Personal service of the subpoena compels Deponent to appear for deposition. (See Code Civ. Proc., ; 2020.220, subds. (b)-(c).) However, Defendant has not demonstrated that he personally served the motion on Deponent, as required by California Rules of Court, rule 3.1346. In fact, it does not appear that Defendant served this motion on Deponent at all. Therefore, the motion is denied without prejudice.

Conclusion and Order

Defendant’s motion to compel Deponent to appear for deposition is denied without prejudice for failure to give proper notice. Defendant is to give notice of this order, and file proof of service of such.

DATED: March 10, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIRINIAN GUY ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALANG BRITTON P. ESQ.