This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2022 at 14:52:11 (UTC).

SUZANNE V. PETERSON VS WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 SUZANNE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PETERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2909

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETERSON SUZANNE V.

Defendants

PEREA SYLVIA

WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY

Defendant Attorney

BERKOWITZ PAUL

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

10/25/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT 37S TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

9/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT 37S TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Case Management Order

9/19/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT 37S TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

9/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT 37S TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

4/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

5/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Answer

5/31/2022: Answer

Order - Dismissal

6/2/2022: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/02/2022

6/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION REGARDING DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT

6/2/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION REGARDING DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2023
  • Hearing10/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2023
  • Hearing10/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 06/02/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketStipulation - No Order JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Wells Fargo & Company (Defendant); Sylvia Perea (Defendant); As to: Suzanne V. Peterson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT 37S TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER; Filed by: Suzanne V. Peterson (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice OF DEPARTMENT 37S TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER; Filed by: Suzanne V. Peterson (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Wells Fargo & Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Suzanne V. Peterson (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Wells Fargo & Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Suzanne V. Peterson (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Wells Fargo & Company (Defendant); Sylvia Perea (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Suzanne V. Peterson (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Wells Fargo & Company (Defendant); Sylvia Perea (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Suzanne V. Peterson (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Wells Fargo & Company (Defendant); Sylvia Perea (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard J. Burdge, Jr. in Department 37 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less