This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2022 at 05:26:12 (UTC).

SUZANNE M. EMERSON, ET AL. VS JEFFREY L MARTIN

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 SUZANNE M EMERSON, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JEFFREY L MARTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7993

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COOK AUSTIN J

EMERSON SUZANNE M.

Defendant

MARTIN JEFFREY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHER LISA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/29/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/1/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/22/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Suzanne M. Emerson (Plaintiff); Austin J Cook (Plaintiff); As to: Jeffrey L Martin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jeffrey L Martin (Defendant); As to: Suzanne M. Emerson (Plaintiff); Austin J Cook (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Suzanne M. Emerson (Plaintiff); As to: Jeffrey L Martin (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/05/2022; Service Cost: 260.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAddress for Lisa Fisher (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Suzanne M. Emerson (Plaintiff); Austin J Cook (Plaintiff); As to: Jeffrey L Martin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Suzanne M. Emerson (Plaintiff); Austin J Cook (Plaintiff); As to: Jeffrey L Martin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Suzanne M. Emerson (Plaintiff); Austin J Cook (Plaintiff); As to: Jeffrey L Martin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Suzanne M. Emerson (Plaintiff); Austin J Cook (Plaintiff); As to: Jeffrey L Martin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHER LISA