This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2022 at 21:30:26 (UTC).

SUZANNE IVES VS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 SUZANNE IVES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1160

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IVES SUZANNE

Defendants

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AT LOS ANGELES

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

UCLA MEDICAL CENTER

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA LOS ANGELES RONALD REAGAN MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

7/18/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/18/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SUZANNE IVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SUZANNE IVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SUZANNE IVES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UCLA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant