Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 10:59:12 (UTC).

SUSIE PEREZ VS KG CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS USA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 SUSIE PEREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KG CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS USA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6269

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ SUSIE

Defendants

KG CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KG CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ORLAND JAMES

ORLAND JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

5/11/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Case Management Statement

5/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/12/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND/OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTR...)

5/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND/OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTR...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

1/8/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/11/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/11/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/2/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • Hearing06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference (and/or Order to Show Cause re Entry of Default) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference and/or Order to Show Cause re Entr...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default rejected); Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susie Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KG CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORLAND JAMES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORLAND JAMES J.