Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 17:46:53 (UTC).

SUSANA SNGIEM VS MOLLECA SENG SNUN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 SUSANA SNGIEM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MOLLECA SENG SNUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9724

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SNGIEM SUSANA

Defendants

SNUN MOLLECA SENG

CLARK DARRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OLSON SONALI

Other Attorneys

NGUYEN MINH T. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/29/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 03/30/2021

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 03/30/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

3/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Declaration - DECLARATION ISO OF MTS

3/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION ISO OF MTS

Request for Judicial Notice

3/2/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

3/2/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Proof of Personal Service

1/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

1/29/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

1/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF ADDRESS FOR E-SERVICE

12/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ADDRESS FOR E-SERVICE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/30/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • Hearing07/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 03/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Susana Sngiem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Molleca Seng Snun (Defendant); Darrell Clark (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (iso of MTS); Filed by Molleca Seng Snun (Defendant); Darrell Clark (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS STATED IN THE COMPLAINT;); Filed by Molleca Seng Snun (Defendant); Darrell Clark (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Susana Sngiem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Susana Sngiem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Susana Sngiem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susana Sngiem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Address for E-Service); Filed by Susana Sngiem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susana Sngiem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susana Sngiem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NGUYEN MINH T.