This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 11:12:45 (UTC).

SUSANA MEJIA VS AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 SUSANA MEJIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6176

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEJIA SUSANA

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AIR TYME AC & HEATING SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELIE ERIK STEPHEN

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

STOCKALPER PATRICK EDWARD

LAMHOFER ERIC T.

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/8/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/23/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

2/23/2021: Answer

Answer

1/25/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

1/25/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

12/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/26/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/5/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/5/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/24/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/13/2020: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Hearing12/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Air Tyme AC & Heating Service, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Azusa Pacific University, a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Azusa Pacific University, a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-complaint); Filed by Air Tyme AC & Heating Service, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Air Tyme AC & Heating Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Air Tyme AC & Heating Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice Of Association Of Counsel); Filed by SUSANA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Azusa Pacific University, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Azusa Pacific University, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SUSANA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by SUSANA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SUSANA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SUSANA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SUSANA MEJIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELIE ERIK S.