*******0662
02/10/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Los Angeles, California
SHIRLEY K. WATKINS
GURROLA ROCHA SUSANA EDUVIJES
RUBIO JUAN
SILVA JONATHAN RICHARD
BELLOSO DULCE C.
CHAMPION KIA
2/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet
2/10/2023: Complaint
2/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
2/10/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
2/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference
3/24/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/3/2023: Case Management Statement
4/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Hearing06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/28/2023 08:30 AM
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Richard Silva (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/11/2023; Service Cost: 69.16; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Richard Silva (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Richard Silva (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Richard Silva (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read Less