This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2023 at 01:01:26 (UTC).

SUSANA EDUVIJES GURROLA ROCHA, ET AL. VS JONATHAN RICHARD SILVA

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 SUSANA EDUVIJES GURROLA ROCHA, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JONATHAN RICHARD SILVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0662

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GURROLA ROCHA SUSANA EDUVIJES

RUBIO JUAN

Defendant

SILVA JONATHAN RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BELLOSO DULCE C.

CHAMPION KIA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/10/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/24/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

4/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Settlement

6/1/2023: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/2/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha, et al. on 02/10/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha and Juan Rubio as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Richard Silva (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: Yes; Settlement Type: Unconditional; OSC re: Dismissal Date: 07/18/2023; OSC re: Dismissal Time: 0830 am; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/28/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Richard Silva (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/11/2023; Service Cost: 69.16; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Richard Silva (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Richard Silva (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Susana Eduvijes Gurrola Rocha (Plaintiff); Juan Rubio (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Richard Silva (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less