This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 06:47:02 (UTC).

SUSANA BARRERA VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 SUSANA BARRERA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1679

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRERA SUSANA

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROMAN PATRICIA

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE PERMANENTE FEDERATION LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALENCIA MARK JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

ESQUEDA THERESA WYNNE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/26/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/26/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/26/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/26/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/26/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/10/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/14/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/14/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

3/14/2023: Answer

Answer

3/14/2023: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • Hearing05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • Hearing05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Susana Barrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Susana Barrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Susana Barrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Susana Barrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: Susana Barrera (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: Susana Barrera (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Susana Barrera (Plaintiff); As to: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, a California corporation (Defendant); THE PERMANENTE FEDERATION LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Susana Barrera (Plaintiff); As to: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, a California corporation (Defendant); THE PERMANENTE FEDERATION LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Susana Barrera (Plaintiff); As to: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, a California corporation (Defendant); THE PERMANENTE FEDERATION LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department 68 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less