This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 11:47:20 (UTC).

SUSAN TITLE, TRUSTEE OF THE SUSAN TITLE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 16, 2011, ET AL. VS SVATEK BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 SUSAN TITLE, TRUSTEE OF THE SUSAN TITLE LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 16, 2011 filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SVATEK BUILDERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1160

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TITLE SUSAN

TITLE SUSAN TRUSTEE OF THE SUSAN TITLE LIVING TRUST

Defendants

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

SVATEK BRETT EMIL

SVATEK BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RING BART IVAN

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/4/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - [AMENDED] NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

8/16/2021: Notice - [AMENDED] NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

8/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • Hearing12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER); Filed by Susan Title, Trustee of the Susan Title Living Trust Dated November 16, 2011 (Plaintiff); Susan Title (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docket[AMENDED] NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; Filed by Susan Title, Trustee of the Susan Title Living Trust Dated November 16, 2011 (Plaintiff); Susan Title (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susan Title, Trustee of the Susan Title Living Trust Dated November 16, 2011 (Plaintiff); Susan Title (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susan Title, Trustee of the Susan Title Living Trust Dated November 16, 2011 (Plaintiff); Susan Title (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susan Title, Trustee of the Susan Title Living Trust Dated November 16, 2011 (Plaintiff); Susan Title (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RING BART IVAN