This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 13:45:52 (UTC).

SUSAN SPARKMAN VS 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC DBA ADVANCED REHAB CENTER OF TUSTIN

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 SUSAN SPARKMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC DBA ADVANCED REHAB CENTER OF TUSTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5235

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TANDY KELLY

SPARKMAN SUSAN

Defendants

2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC DBA ADVANCED REHAB CENTER OF TUSTIN

JADEITE MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLINT LISA TRINH

Defendant Attorney

WALKER KATHLEEN MARIE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/8/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

3/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/13/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE SUPER...)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE SUPER...)

Notice of Ruling

12/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/3/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/22/2019

10/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/22/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

10/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

7/23/2019: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Susan Sparkman on 05/02/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Susan Sparkman and Kelly Tandy as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 06/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 06/15/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Glendale Courthouse in Department E - Hon. David A. Roseneffective 06/14/2021; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 06/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 07/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/15/2021 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 4B Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Kelly Tandy; Filed by: Susan Sparkman (Plaintiff); As to: 2210 Santa Ana OPCO, LLC dba Advanced Rehab Center of Tustin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Susan Sparkman (Plaintiff); As to: 2210 Santa Ana OPCO, LLC dba Advanced Rehab Center of Tustin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Susan Sparkman (Plaintiff); As to: 2210 Santa Ana OPCO, LLC dba Advanced Rehab Center of Tustin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Susan Sparkman (Plaintiff); As to: 2210 Santa Ana OPCO, LLC dba Advanced Rehab Center of Tustin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Susan Sparkman (Plaintiff); As to: 2210 Santa Ana OPCO, LLC dba Advanced Rehab Center of Tustin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******5235    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: E

PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Date: 12/13/19

Case: Susan Sparkman, et al. v. 2210 Santa Ana Opco, LLC, et al. (19 STCV15235)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants’ Petition to Compel Binding Arbitration is GRANTED in part.

The Court finds that as to the first through fourth causes of action of the Complaint, defendants have sufficiently established that an agreement to arbitrate those controversies exist, that there is no showing that there has been any waiver of the right to compel arbitration, and no showing that the agreement has been rescinded or that grounds exist for rescission of the agreement. Plaintiff Susan Sparkman, by her successor in interest Kelly Tandy, and defendants 2210 Santa Ana Opco, LLC dba Advanced Rehab Center of Tustin and Jadeite Management, LLC are ordered to arbitrate this matter according to their Resident Facility Arbitration Agreement.

As to the fifth cause of action for wrongful death brought by plaintiff Kelly Tandy as an individual, the motion is DENIED. Kelly Tandy as an individual did not agree to arbitrate her claims, and she is not bound by the agreement entered into by Susan Sparkman. (See Daniels v. Sunrise Senior Living, Inc. (2013) 212 Cal.App.4th 674, 684; Bush v. Horizon West (2012) 205 Cala.App.4th 924, 930.)

Because the arbitration agreement explicitly excludes the provisions of CCP ; 1281.2(c), the Court does not have, and would not exercise, any discretion to deny the request to compel arbitration.

Pursuant to CCP ; 1281.4, this Court shall stay this action until an arbitration is had in accordance with the order to arbitration herein.