This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2020 at 00:50:37 (UTC).

SUSAN SMITH VS PASADENA RECOVERY CENTER INC

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 SUSAN SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PASADENA RECOVERY CENTER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9498

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SMITH SUSAN

Defendants and Respondents

PASADENA RECOVERY CENTER INC

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

VAZIRI SIAMAK ESQ.

VAZIRI SIAMAK

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JAMES J KJAR ESQ.

KJAR JAMES JORGEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/25/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING DATE FOR MSJ

7/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING DATE FOR MSJ

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) OF 09/10/2020

9/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) OF 09/10/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

9/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL FROM MAY 18, 2020 TO OCTOBER 12, 2020 TO ACCOMMODATE SCHEDULED MEDIATION

3/20/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL FROM MAY 18, 2020 TO OCTOBER 12, 2020 TO ACCOMMODATE SCHEDULED MEDIATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES PER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MELISSA M. WETKOWSK

3/20/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES PER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MELISSA M. WETKOWSK

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, PASADENA RECOVERY CENTER, ...) OF 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, PASADENA RECOVERY CENTER, ...) OF 03/24/2020

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES PER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

3/24/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES PER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES PER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

10/1/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES PER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRI...)

10/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRI...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL FROM DECEMBER 3, 2019 TO MAY 18, 2020

10/1/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL FROM DECEMBER 3, 2019 TO MAY 18, 2020

Notice of Ruling

10/3/2019: Notice of Ruling

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

6/12/2018: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

1/8/2018: SUMMONS -

UNLIMITED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY ;ETC

1/8/2018: UNLIMITED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY ;ETC

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Pasadena Recovery Center, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal for failure to prosecute) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial ((1x5mos)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Susan Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order to Set Aside MSJ Judgment); Filed by Pasadena Recovery Center, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 10/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pasadena Recovery Center, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Pasadena Recovery Center, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Pasadena Recovery Center, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Susan Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketUNLIMITED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susan Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC689498    Hearing Date: September 10, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

SUSAN SMITH ,

Plaintiff,

v.

PASADENA RECOVERY CENTER, INC., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC689498

Hearing Date: September 10, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Background

Plaintiff Susan Smith (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant Pasadena Recovery Center, Inc. (“Defendant”), asserting causes of action for premises liability and negligence. Specifically, Plaintiff alleges that she was participating in a counseling session when her chair collapsed, causing injury. Now, Defendant moves for summary judgment, which Plaintiff does not oppose. The motion is granted.

LEGAL STANDARD

“[T]he party moving for summary judgment bears the burden of persuasion that there is no triable issue of material fact and that he is entitled to judgment as a matter of law[.]  There is a triable issue of material fact if, and only if, the evidence would allow a reasonable trier of fact to find the underlying fact in favor of the party opposing the motion in accordance with the applicable standard of proof.”  (Aguilar v. Atlantic Richfield Co. (2001) 25 Cal.4th 826, 850.)  “[T]he party moving for summary judgment bears an initial burden of production to make a prima facie showing of the nonexistence of any triable issue of material fact; if he carries his burden of production, he causes a shift, and the opposing party is then subjected to a burden of production of his own to make a prima facie showing of the existence of a triable issue of material fact.”  (Ibid.)  In ruling on the motion, “the court may not weigh the plaintiff's evidence or inferences against the defendant[’s] as though it were sitting as the trier of fact.”  (Id. at 856.)  However, the court “must . . . determine what any evidence or inference could show or imply to a reasonable trier of fact.”  (Ibid., emphasis original.)  

DISCUSSION

Defendant argues that Plaintiff’s claims are barred by the release of liability signed by Plaintiff. The release covers all personal injuries, including bodily injuries. This release is sufficient to satisfy Defendant’s burden of proof, shifting the burden to Plaintiff to proffer some evidence to give rise to a triable issue, e.g., evidence of gross negligence which might defeat the waiver, etc. Plaintiff fails to do so, as she files no opposition, and there is no evidence in the record giving rise to a triable issue. Therefore, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion for summary judgment is granted. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: September 10, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court