This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2020 at 11:31:23 (UTC).

SUSAN PAK VS KAP SIL CHOI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 SUSAN PAK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KAP SIL CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4722

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAK SUSAN

Defendants

RHEE PIL SEUNG

CHO NAM SIK

KIM CHRISTINE

LEE SO YONG

KIM MOON SUNG

NA SOO HYON

JEON HYON SOOK

CHUNG MYUNG SIK

SHIN SAE YEON

CHOI KAP SIL

HONG KYEONG WHAN

YOON HYE Y.

CHOI KI YUN

KWON TAE SEUNG

KIM YEON SU

BAE PYUNG H.

CHO NAM JIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JAMIE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

10/25/2019: Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

Exhibit List

9/26/2019: Exhibit List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

9/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/14/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/26/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/26/2019: Complaint

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketStipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing (for Quiet Title Action) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice (of entry of judgment); Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing for Quiet Title Action)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketJudgment (After Court Trial- Deft Did Not Appear); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketTrial Brief; Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susan Pak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NA SOO HYON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JAMIE