This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 09:31:09 (UTC).

SUSAN OLTMAN VS WESCOM CENTRAL CREDIT UNION

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 SUSAN OLTMAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WESCOM CENTRAL CREDIT UNION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0537

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLTMAN SUSAN

Defendant

WESCOM CENTRAL CREDIT UNION AKA WESCOM CREDIT UNION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARIZA JANET A.

MILLER DAVID SCOTT

Defendant Attorneys

WATSON MARY AGNES

FISHER MARY WATSON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/1/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/1/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND ORDER

9/16/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION

11/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION

Status Report - STATUS REPORT RE: ARBITRATION

5/24/2021: Status Report - STATUS REPORT RE: ARBITRATION

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/19/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...) OF 06/01/2021

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF...) OF 06/01/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Joint Status Conference Report

10/13/2021: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference; Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by Wescom Central Credit Union (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Arbitration) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...) of 06/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND ORDER); Filed by Susan Oltman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susan Oltman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susan Oltman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susan Oltman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESCOM CENTRAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHER MARY WATSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON MARY AGNES ESQ.