Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 15:35:48 (UTC).

SUSAN NIEMANN, AN INDIVIDUAL, VS OPRI & ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 SUSAN NIEMANN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against OPRI ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2884

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NIEMANN AN INDIVIDUAL SUSAN

NIEMANN SUSAN

Defendants

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

OPRI AN INDIVIDUAL DEBRA

OPRI & ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OPRI & ASSOCIATES

OPRI DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARR SCOTT H.

Defendant Attorney

FELDMAN KENNETH CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEBRA OPRI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

2/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEBRA OPRI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KENNETH C. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

2/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KENNETH C. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/1/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Case Management Statement

2/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/10/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/14/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/23/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • Hearing05/03/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Hearing05/03/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Opri & Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Opri & Associates (Defendant); Debra Opri (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kenneth C. Feldman in Support of Petition To Compel Binding Arbitration); Filed by Opri & Associates (Defendant); Debra Opri (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Susan Niemann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Susan Niemann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Debra Opri in Support of Petition to Compel Binding Arbitration); Filed by Opri & Associates (Defendant); Debra Opri (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Susan Niemann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Susan Niemann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Susan Niemann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susan Niemann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susan Niemann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susan Niemann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPRI & ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARR SCOTT H.