This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 00:20:55 (UTC).

SUSAN NEYLAN VS ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 SUSAN NEYLAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0764

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEYLAN SUSAN

Defendants

20/20 PLUMBING AND HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHACON MICHAEL

20/20 PLUMBING AND HEATING INC.

ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAW COLLEEN

Defendant Attorneys

PICOZZI ED

PICOZZI EDWARD M

WINTER CHANDRA

 

Court Documents

Judgment - JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL

9/10/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT;)

9/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT;)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

9/10/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT;) OF 09/10/2021

9/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT;) OF 09/10/2021

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/29/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANT, MICHAEL CHACON'S TRIAL BRIEF

7/26/2021: Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANT, MICHAEL CHACON'S TRIAL BRIEF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (TWO DAYS))

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (TWO DAYS))

Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT

6/28/2021: Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT

Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT

6/28/2021: Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT

Trial Brief

6/28/2021: Trial Brief

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

12/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

2/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT MICHAEL CHACONS RESPONSES TO REQUESTS

2/17/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT MICHAEL CHACONS RESPONSES TO REQUESTS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COLLEEN SHAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

2/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COLLEEN SHAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/17/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF COLLEEN SHAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT MICHAEL CHACONS RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND INTERROGATORIES, TO DEEM REQUESTS F

2/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF COLLEEN SHAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT MICHAEL CHACONS RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND INTERROGATORIES, TO DEEM REQUESTS F

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketat 3:13 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketJudgment (After Court Trial); Filed by Susan Neylan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order; Notice of Entry of Judgment;) of 09/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order; Notice of Entry of Judgment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Susan Neylan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((two days))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((two days)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (two days))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketTrial Brief (DEFENDANT, MICHAEL CHACON'S TRIAL BRIEF); Filed by Michael Chacon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael Chacon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docket1st Amended Complaint; Filed by Susan Neylan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susan Neylan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susan Neylan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susan Neylan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINTER CHANDRA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICOZZI ED