Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 10:40:53 (UTC).

SUSAN GALLOWAY VS BOARD OF ADMINISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 SUSAN GALLOWAY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOARD OF ADMINISTRATION OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9320

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALLOWAY SUSAN

Defendant

BOARD OF ADMIN. OF CAL. PUBLIC EMPLOYEES

Interested Party and Not Classified By Court

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

PETER ARNOLD PHILIMON

PETER ARNOLD P.

FARAHAN EYAL PHILIMON

COFFEY RORY JEROME

Other Attorneys

BERLINER STEVEN MARC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

9/9/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/23/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT STAY, RESTORE CASE TO...)

6/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT STAY, RESTORE CASE TO...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

3/7/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

1/16/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

1/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

Other - - Verified Petition

9/10/2018: Other - - Verified Petition

Request for Administrative File -

9/10/2018: Request for Administrative File -

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

9/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Answer - to Verified Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandate

10/17/2018: Answer - to Verified Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandate

Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Opposition - Opposition To Defendant California Public Employees' Retirement System's Demurrer to Verified Complaint

11/5/2018: Opposition - Opposition To Defendant California Public Employees' Retirement System's Demurrer to Verified Complaint

Motion for Sanctions

12/3/2018: Motion for Sanctions

Declaration - Declaration of Arnold P. Peter in opposition to respondent

12/3/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Arnold P. Peter in opposition to respondent

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • Hearing03/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SUSAN GALLOWAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BOARD OF ADMIN. OF CAL. PUBLIC EMPLOYEES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by SUSAN GALLOWAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketRequest; Filed by SUSAN GALLOWAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SUSAN GALLOWAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketVerified Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketRequest (REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Administrative File

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERLINER STEVEN M.