This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 09:43:49 (UTC).

SUSAN GALE LINN VS MICHAELS STORES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 SUSAN GALE LINN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MICHAELS STORES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5926

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINN SUSAN GALE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MICHAELS STORES INC.

PLAZA INV. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

ETC GP LLC

PLAZA INV. II L.P.

PLAZA DE ORO GP LLC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M.

Defendant Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

9/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/13/2021: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

8/13/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

5/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

5/20/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/27/2021: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2024
  • Hearing04/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • Hearing10/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF UNAVAILABILITY); Filed by Michaels Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Michaels Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Michaels Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michaels Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susan Gale Linn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susan Gale Linn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susan Gale Linn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Susan Gale Linn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Susan Gale Linn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susan Gale Linn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susan Gale Linn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susan Gale Linn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAZA INV. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNER is a litigant

Latest cases where PLAZA INV II A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where Michaels Stores a Texas Corporation doing business as The Michaels Companies is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARZBAN MICHAEL M.