This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 12:43:44 (UTC).

SUSAN ELIZABETH GILES, ET AL. VS BIANCA MARIE CERVANTES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 SUSAN ELIZABETH GILES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIANCA MARIE CERVANTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6218

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GILES CHRISTOPHER

GILES SUSAN ELIZABETH

Defendants

CERVANTES BIANCA MARIE

CERVANTES REFUGIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OUNJIAN ROBERT JOHN

LEVENTHAL STANLEY R.

Defendant Attorneys

MARTINDALE KIERSTEN ALYSSA

CAMPOS VICTOR M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/18/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

6/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Association of Attorney

7/20/2021: Association of Attorney

Notice of Settlement

8/2/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 08/02/2021

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 08/02/2021

Substitution of Attorney

8/3/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

8/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

8/30/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/7/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

8/25/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/25/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/25/2020: Answer

PI General Order

7/24/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Susan Elizabeth Giles (Plaintiff); Christopher Giles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Refugio Cervantes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Bianca Marie Cervantes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:49 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement of Entire ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement of Entire ...) of 08/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Susan Elizabeth Giles (Plaintiff); Christopher Giles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Bianca Marie Cervantes (Defendant); Refugio Cervantes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Bianca Marie Cervantes (Defendant); Refugio Cervantes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Susan Elizabeth Giles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Susan Elizabeth Giles (Plaintiff); Christopher Giles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susan Elizabeth Giles (Plaintiff); Christopher Giles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susan Elizabeth Giles (Plaintiff); Christopher Giles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susan Elizabeth Giles (Plaintiff); Christopher Giles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susan Elizabeth Giles (Plaintiff); Christopher Giles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINDALE, KIERSTEN A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPOS VICTOR M.