This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 20:37:12 (UTC).

SUSAN D. AGLIPAY, ET AL. VS ASTRA FLOORING COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 SUSAN D AGLIPAY, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASTRA FLOORING COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5549

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGLIPAY RONALD M. JR.

AGLIPAY SUSAN D.

Defendants

ASTRA FLOORING COMPANY

BWDAC INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. AKA ALLIED SIGNAL INC.

HOPEMAN BROTHERS INC.

INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY

METALCLAD INSULATION LLC

MORSE TEC LLC AKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BORGWARNER CORPORATION

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

PFIZER INC.

PLANT PRODUCTS & SUPPLY COMPANY

PNEUMO ABEX LLC AKA AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE COMPANY AKA AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE AND FOUNDRY COMPANY INCLUDING THE AMERICA. BRAKEBLOK DIVISION SUCCESSOR BY- MERGER TO THE AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE AND FOUNDRY COMPANY AND THE AMERICAN BRAKEBLOK CORPORATION

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS INC.

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP INC.

VIACOMCBS INC. AKA CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION AKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMELL DAVID L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/14/2022: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUSAN D. AGLIPAY PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 377.32

2/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUSAN D. AGLIPAY PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 377.32

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Brief - PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

3/2/2022: Brief - PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by Susan D. Aglipay (Plaintiff); Ronald M. Aglipay, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Susan D. Aglipay (Plaintiff); Ronald M. Aglipay, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Susan D. Aglipay (Plaintiff); Ronald M. Aglipay, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SUSAN D. AGLIPAY PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 377.32; Filed by Susan D. Aglipay (Plaintiff); Ronald M. Aglipay, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Susan D. Aglipay (Plaintiff); Ronald M. Aglipay, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Susan D. Aglipay (Plaintiff); Ronald M. Aglipay, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less