This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 22:25:01 (UTC).

SUSAN BEDFORD VS J&M 99TH ST. PARTNERS, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 SUSAN BEDFORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against J M 99TH ST PARTNERS, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3461

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEDFORD SUSAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WESTSTAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

J&M 99TH ST. PARTNERS LLC.

Cross Defendant

RODRIGUEZ GUADALUPE DBA RODRIGUEZ CLEANING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOUGH PATRICK H

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MULVIHILL CYNTHIA COULTER

HALL ANN C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/25/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/25/2021: Cross-Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/23/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/26/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2024
  • Hearing04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Cynthia Coulter Mulvihill (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by J&M 99TH ST. PARTNERS, LLC. (Defendant); WESTSTAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by J&M 99TH ST. PARTNERS, LLC. (Defendant); WESTSTAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by J&M 99TH ST. PARTNERS, LLC. (Defendant); WESTSTAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by J&M 99TH ST. PARTNERS, LLC. (Defendant); WESTSTAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SUSAN BEDFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SUSAN BEDFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SUSAN BEDFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SUSAN BEDFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SUSAN BEDFORD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J&M 99TH ST PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTSTAR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOUGH PATRICK HUNT