This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2022 at 19:01:34 (UTC).

SURFSIDE RESTORATION & WATERPROOFING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS CHARLES PANKOW BUILDERS, LTD., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 SURFSIDE RESTORATION WATERPROOFING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHARLES PANKOW BUILDERS, LTD , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0293

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Cross Plaintiffs, Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SURFSIDE RESTORATION & WATERPROOF INC.

COURTNEY INC.

EBERHARD

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CHARLES PANKOW BUILDERS LTD.

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

CHARLES PANKOW BUILDERS LTD.

SURFSIDE RESTORATION & WATERPROOF INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLANCHARD PHILIP

BLANCHARD PHILIP JAMES

Defendant Attorney

MENEKSHE AYHAN

Cross Defendant Attorney

EISENBAUM MICHAEL S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Status Conference); Filed by Surfside Restoration & Waterproof, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Eberhard (Cross-Defendant); Charles Pankow Builders, LTD. (Defendant); Federal Insurance Company (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Surfside Restoration & Waterproof, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer (to Surfside Restoration & Waterproofing, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint); Filed by Courtney, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Eberhard (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Surfside Restoration & Waterproof, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Surfside Restoration & Waterproof, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Surfside Restoration & Waterproof, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Charles Pankow Builders, LTD. (Defendant); Federal Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Charles Pankow Builders, LTD. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by Charles Pankow Builders, LTD. (Defendant); Federal Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Surfside Restoration & Waterproof, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Surfside Restoration & Waterproof, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Surfside Restoration & Waterproof, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Surfside Restoration & Waterproof, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EBERHARD is a litigant

Latest cases where CHARLES PANKOW BUILDERS LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where COURTNEY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant