This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 11:09:23 (UTC).

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY VS LUIS ALFONSO FELIX APODACA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LUIS ALFONSO FELIX APODACA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9736

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

APODACA LUIS ALFONSO FELIX

CASAS J.B. JR.

Cross Defendant

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENZON ROSA MARTINEZ

Defendant Attorney

CASAS JR. J.B.

Cross Defendant Attorney

LE AN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/12/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Cross-Complaint

10/3/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

10/3/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

10/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) SUMS AND X-COMPLAINT

10/21/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) SUMS AND X-COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/14/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • Hearing03/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) SUMS AND X-COMPLAINT; Filed by: J.B. Casas, Jr. (Cross-Complainant); As to: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: J.B. Casas, Jr. (Cross-Complainant); As to: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: J.B. Casas, Jr. (Defendant); As to: Suretec Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: J.B. Casas, Jr. (Defendant); As to: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randolph M. Hammock in Department 49 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Suretec Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Alfonso Felix Apodaca (Defendant); J.B. Casas, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Suretec Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Alfonso Felix Apodaca (Defendant); J.B. Casas, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Suretec Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Alfonso Felix Apodaca (Defendant); J.B. Casas, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE AN