This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 02:42:01 (UTC).

SUPERIOR STAGE CREW, LLC VS ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 SUPERIOR STAGE CREW, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL S. MURPHY and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1614

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL S. MURPHY

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUPERIOR STAGE CREW LLC

Defendant

ROCK OF AGES HOLLYWOOD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH KATHLEEN J.

SPRITZ GARY M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/9/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Settlement

12/30/2020: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR APPLICATION

12/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR APPLICATION

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/4/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES TIPTON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

10/19/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES TIPTON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

10/20/2020: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

10/20/2020: Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

10/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

7/16/2020: Answer

Answer

7/16/2020: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/20/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

6/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/03/2021

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Superior Stage Crew, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2021

DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2021

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2021

Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2021

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2020

DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Superior Stage Crew, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2020

DocketNotice (of Taking Off Calendar Application); Filed by Superior Stage Crew, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
10/19/2020

DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF JAMES TIPTON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER); Filed by Superior Stage Crew, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2020

DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Superior Stage Crew, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2020

DocketAnswer; Filed by Rock of Ages Hollywood LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2020

DocketAnswer; Filed by Rock of Ages Hollywood LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2020

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Superior Stage Crew, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2020

DocketComplaint; Filed by Superior Stage Crew, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2020

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2020

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Superior Stage Crew, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2020

DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Superior Stage Crew, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less