This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2023 at 12:31:37 (UTC).

SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 SUPERCLINICS USA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N A , A NEW YORK CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1103

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUPERCLINICS USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. A NEW YORK CORPORATION DBA CHASE BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBLATT FREDRIC J.

Defendant Attorney

KESPRADIT JANE NUSAREE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/30/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/10/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/18/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

1/25/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1/31/2023: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/02/2023

2/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/02/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

2/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

2/2/2023: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/02/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., a New York Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability; Filed by: SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketAddress for Fredric J. Greenblatt (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., a New York Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 39 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., a New York Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., a New York Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SUPERCLINICS USA, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., a New York Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less