This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2021 at 05:50:03 (UTC).

SUONG TRON HA, ET AL. VS MEB LOAN TRUST IV, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 SUONG TRON HA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MEB LOAN TRUST IV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3047

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HA SUONG TRON

TON HA THI

Defendants

AFFINIA DEFAULT SERVICES LLC

MEB LOAN TRUST IV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAUNDERS GARY S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY FORECLOSURE TRUSTEE PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. CODE 2924L

9/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY FORECLOSURE TRUSTEE PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. CODE 2924L

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

11/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Suong Tron Ha (Plaintiff); Ha Thi Ton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Suong Tron Ha (Plaintiff); Ha Thi Ton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Suong Tron Ha (Plaintiff); Ha Thi Ton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Monetary Status to Plaintiffs? Complaint by Foreclosure Trustee Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Code 2924l); Filed by AFFINIA DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Suong Tron Ha (Plaintiff); Ha Thi Ton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Suong Tron Ha (Plaintiff); Ha Thi Ton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Suong Tron Ha (Plaintiff); Ha Thi Ton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Affina Default Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Meb Loan Trust Iii Us Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAUNDERS GARY S