Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2020 at 03:26:07 (UTC).

SUNSHINE SUPPLY COMPANY, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, VS ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 SUNSHINE SUPPLY COMPANY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLIED ROOFING WATERPROOFING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6719

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNSHINE SUPPLY COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A UNITED STATES FOREIGN STOCK ENTITY

BENCHMARK CONTRACTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LA PLAZA VILLAGE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LA PLAZA DE CULTURA Y ARTES FOUNDATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION

MORLEY BUILDERS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COSSO DENNIS

COSSO DENNIS GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sunshine Supply Company, Inc. a California corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sunshine Supply Company, Inc. a California corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sunshine Supply Company, Inc. a California corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sunshine Supply Company, Inc. a California corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORLEY BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sunshine Supply Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LA PLAZA VILLAGE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant