This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2019 at 03:13:22 (UTC).

SUNSHINE ENTERPRISES, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS GENSLER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 SUNSHINE ENTERPRISES, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENSLER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6594

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNSHINE ENTERPRISES LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DBA SHORE HOTEL

Defendants

GENSLER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BENCHMARK CONTRACTORS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

M. ARTHUR GENSLER JR. & ASSOCIATES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAVINE AARON ESQ.

LAVINE AARON MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

SUH JASON W

DERECAT CRAIG JOSEPH

FRANKLIN RUSSELL ALAN

 

Court Documents

Order

9/16/2019: Order

Request for Judicial Notice

7/19/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

7/19/2019: Declaration

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

7/19/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

7/19/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice

7/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

7/22/2019: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

7/22/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Case Management Statement

7/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

8/12/2019: Minute Order

Opposition

8/23/2019: Opposition

Reply

8/29/2019: Reply

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/14/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketOrder (re: Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Anthony Mason Associates, Inc. Erroneously Sued As AMA, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketOrder (Sustaining Defendant M. Arthur Gensler Jr. & Associates, Inc.'s Demurrer, or in the Alternative Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by M. Arthur Gensler Jr. & Associates, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketOrder (re Defendant Benchmark Contractors, Inc.'s Demurrer to Complaint); Filed by Benchmark Contractors, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (by Defendant M. Arthur Gensler Jr. & Associates, Inc.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (by Defendant Anthony Mason) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (by Defendant Benchmark Contractors, Inc.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) by D...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Benchmark Contractors, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice (Of Case Management Conference); Filed by Sunshine Enterprises, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sunshine Enterprises, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sunshine Enterprises, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sunshine Enterprises, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Sunshine Enterprises, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sunshine Enterprises, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sunshine Enterprises, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sunshine Enterprises, LP, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where M. ARTHUR GENSLER JR. & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNSHINE ENTERPRISES LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DBA SHORE HOTEL is a litigant

Latest cases where GENSLER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant