This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 07:40:38 (UTC).

SUNPOWER CAPITAL, LLC VS NATASHA BURTON

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 SUNPOWER CAPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATASHA BURTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2392

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNPOWER CAPITAL LLC

Defendant

BURTON NATASHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

11/17/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/28/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

2/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA P. FRIEDMAN RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS DILIGENCE

4/5/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA P. FRIEDMAN RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS DILIGENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

4/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 04/21/2023

4/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 04/21/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA P. FRIEDMAN RE: OSC

5/2/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA P. FRIEDMAN RE: OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/06/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/06/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF JOSHUA P. FRIEDMAN RE: OSC; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Natasha Burton (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Natasha Burton (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SunPower Capital, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Natasha Burton (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less