This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 03:21:39 (UTC).

SUNG SOO KIM VS A-JU TOURS, INC.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 SUNG SOO KIM filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against A-JU TOURS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3084

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM SUNG SOO

Defendants

MUTUAL TRANS INC.

BAHK HANMI

BAHK DANIEL PYOUNG AKA PYOUNG SIK BAK

BAHK HELEN YOUNG

A-JU TOURS INC.

BAHK HENRY H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARLIS BRENT P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/11/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/27/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/29/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/23/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/DEFAULT/ANSWER)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/DEFAULT/ANSWER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/DEFAULT/ANSWER) OF 03/04/2021

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/DEFAULT/ANSWER) OF 03/04/2021

Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE NON SERVICE REPORT

1/21/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE NON SERVICE REPORT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/ANSWER) OF 01/27/2021

1/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROOF OF SERVICE/ANSWER) OF 01/27/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES SUNG SOO KIM

12/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES SUNG SOO KIM

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • Hearing11/12/2021 at 10:35 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:26 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sung Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Sung Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDefault/Answer) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Sung Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sung Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Sung Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sung Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sung Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sung Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sung Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUTUAL TRANS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A-JU TOURS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARLIS BRENT PHILIP