This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 22:02:28 (UTC).

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC. VS FIRST ON XITE EQUIPMENT SERVICES LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2023 SUNBELT RENTALS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIRST ON XITE EQUIPMENT SERVICES LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0614

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNBELT RENTALS INC.

Defendants

DOES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

FIRST ON XITE EQUIPMENT SERVICES LLC

RODRIGUEZ JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSBORNE AMY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/1/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

3/8/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/8/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: First On Xite Equipment Services LLC (Defendant); Jorge Rodriguez (Defendant); DOES 1-10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: First On Xite Equipment Services LLC (Defendant); Jorge Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: First On Xite Equipment Services LLC (Defendant); Jorge Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less