This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2019 at 02:40:37 (UTC).

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC. VS CAL-GREEN AUTO BODY, INC ., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 SUNBELT RENTALS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CAL-GREEN AUTO BODY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0327

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNBELT RENTALS INC.

Defendants

NALCHYAN DIANA

NALCHYAN SONIA

KESHISHYAN ARMAND

CAL-GREEN AUTO BODY INC .

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGARRY JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/10/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER AND OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER AND OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/16/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/16/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

7/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 07/09/2019

7/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 07/09/2019

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/3/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/17/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/15/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/15/2019: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF MINUTE ORDER AND OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNBELT RENTALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGARRY JAMES J. ESQ