This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2020 at 07:36:12 (UTC).

SUN YOUNG NA VS JUAN ROBERTO SERRANO ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/30/2018 SUN YOUNG NA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN ROBERTO SERRANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4536

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NA SUN YOUNG

Defendants and Respondents

MIKES TIREMAN INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

SERRANO JUAN ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEE DUNCAN DAVID ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LALLY RAVI

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/7/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER

1/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/7/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

2/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling

2/13/2020: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Continue Trial Date

2/14/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Answer

9/20/2019: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/3/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

3/19/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/19/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Answer

3/20/2019: Answer

SUMMONS -

4/30/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/30/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • Hearing04/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Hearing04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Hearing04/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Hearing03/16/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Mikes Tireman Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Juan Roberto Serrano (Defendant); Mikes Tireman Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to continue trial); Filed by Mikes Tireman Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER); Filed by Juan Roberto Serrano (Defendant); Mikes Tireman Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Juan Roberto Serrano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Mikes Tireman Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mikes Tireman Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Mikes Tireman Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Mikes Tireman Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sun Young Na (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sun Young Na (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704536    Hearing Date: March 16, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On April 30, 2018, plaintiff Sun Young Na (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants for injuries sustained in a motor vehicle accident. Trial is currently scheduled for April 30, 2020. Defendants move to continue the trial date to July 30, 2020. Two continuances have been granted before.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

Defendant argues the parties need to complete discovery, conduct a medical examination of Plaintiff, and attend mediation. Plaintiff stipulates to the continuance.

The Court finds good cause to continue the trial. Trial is continued to July 30, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 27 at Spring Street Courthouse. The Final Status Conference is continued to July 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 27 at Spring Street Courthouse. All discovery and motion cut-off dates to be based on the new trial date. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses and experts of the new date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date jointly selected by the parties. The Court presumes the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel, witnesses and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel, witnesses, and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. The parties are to schedule depositions, the medical examination, and the mediation forthwith. No further continuances should be expected, and delay in scheduling depositions, the exam, or the mediation will not be good cause for another continuance.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.