Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 05:03:42 (UTC).

SUN, WAI LAN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 SUN, WAI LAN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BOGDANOFF, LEE R. and LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9035

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SUN IVAN

Decedent

SUN WAI LAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HSU ROGER C

 

Court Documents

Supplement - Second

7/12/2021: Supplement - Second

Minute Order

7/9/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/4/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

2/11/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Supplement - Supplement to Petition

2/23/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Petition

Proof of Publication

3/1/2021: Proof of Publication

Minute Order

3/9/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/3/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial)

10/29/2020: Petition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

10/29/2020: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Second ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to Petition ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU ROGER C.