This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2023 at 08:33:53 (UTC).

SUN OK RHEE VS MICHELLE HEE LUM ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/11/2017 SUN OK RHEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHELLE HEE LUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6538

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RHEE SUN OK

Defendants

LUM MICHELLE HEE

RHEE JAMES SANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN RICHARD D.

Defendant Attorneys

HOLLY MARTIN DOUGLAS

PERKINS JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/29/2020

5/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/29/2020

Notice of Settlement

5/29/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

5/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 20, 2020)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 20, 2020)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 20, 2020) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 20, 2020) OF 04/15/2020

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING

1/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF

1/17/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL D...)

1/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL D...)

Association of Attorney

12/9/2019: Association of Attorney

Motion to Continue Trial Date

10/15/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling

11/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/2/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

2/1/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/5/2018: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

3/5/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

3/5/2018: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SUN OK RHEE on 12/11/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sun Ok Rhee as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Michelle Hee Lum (Defendant); James Sang Rhee (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 05/29/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: notice of settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 07/09/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/29/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 07/09/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- James J. Perkins (Attorney): Organization Name: Colman Law Group; Name Suffix: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketAddress for James J. Perkins (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketDocument:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketDocument:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 12/11/20 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 06/11/19 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 05/28/19 at 10:00 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6538    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

sun ok rhee,

Plaintiff,

v.

michelle hee lum, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****6538

Hearing Date: November 12, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Defendants Michelle Hee Lum and James Sang Rhee (“Defendants”) move to continue the trial date, currently set for December 12, 2019, to March 2, 2020. Plaintiff Sun Ok Rhee has stipulated to the continuance. The parties seek a continuance to pursue mediation. The parties have agreed to use Judicate West and are in the process of selecting a mediator and scheduling the meditation. Therefore, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court grants Defendants’ motion to continue the trial and all related dates. The Court advances and vacates the current date, and sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: February 18, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: March 3, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be governed by the new trial date. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 12, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court