Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2021 at 19:28:15 (UTC).

SUN, LAURA VS TRAN, WILSON NGO

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 SUN, LAURA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against TRAN, WILSON NGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA, COPS, JENNIFER H. and WEINER, TIMOTHY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1249

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

COPS, JENNIFER H.

WEINER, TIMOTHY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SUN LAURA

Respondents

TRAU WILSON NGO

TRAN WILSON NGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HEMINGWAY COLLEEN ELIZABETH

Respondent Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Electronic Re: RFO Re: Motion to Enforce Stipulation and Order Re: Temp. Dom. Violence Restraining Order

5/19/2021: Proof of Service - Electronic Re: RFO Re: Motion to Enforce Stipulation and Order Re: Temp. Dom. Violence Restraining Order

Proof of Service - Mail - Re: RFO Re: Motion to Enforce Stipulation and Order Re: Temp. Domestic Violence Restraining Order

5/19/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Re: RFO Re: Motion to Enforce Stipulation and Order Re: Temp. Domestic Violence Restraining Order

Minute Order

5/18/2021: Minute Order

RFO/MTN - Family Law - RE: Motion to Enforce Stipulation and Order Re: Temporary Domestic Violence Restraining Order

5/18/2021: RFO/MTN - Family Law - RE: Motion to Enforce Stipulation and Order Re: Temporary Domestic Violence Restraining Order

Stipulation and Order

11/18/2020: Stipulation and Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

11/18/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/18/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

11/18/2020: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

10/1/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

10/2/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Substitution of Attorney

10/2/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

10/2/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Proof of Service

9/29/2020: Proof of Service

Minute Order

10/2/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/2/2020: Minute Order

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

9/11/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/11/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/14/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Hearing07/06/2021 at 8:30 AM in As Assigned (S14,S15,S16) at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Re: RFO Re: Motion to Enforce Stipulation and Order Re: Temp. Domestic Violence Restraining Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Electronic Re: RFO Re: Motion to Enforce Stipulation and Order Re: Temp. Dom. Violence Restraining Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Weiner, Timothy M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Family Law (RE: Motion to Enforce Stipulation and Order Re: Temporary Domestic Violence Restraining Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less