This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 02:50:09 (UTC).

SUMAN PATEL MD INC VS JESSICA HERRERA ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 SUMAN PATEL MD INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JESSICA HERRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6705

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SUMAN PATEL M.D. INC

Respondents and Defendants

VILLANUEVA YAJAIRA

MARTINE EDGER

HERRERA JESSICA

DOES 1 TO 10

DELGADO CLAUDIA LIZETTE HERNANDEZ

MOLINA NORA B. LOPEZ

MARTINEZ EDGAR OMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KAR JOSEPH M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

1/10/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

1/10/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

1/24/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

2/1/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/2/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

2/16/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/19/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

3/19/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/14/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF WITNESSS EXPECTED TO BE CALLED AT TRIAL

7/20/2018: PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF WITNESSS EXPECTED TO BE CALLED AT TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF WITNESSES EXPECTED TO BE CALLED AT TRIAL

7/20/2018: PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF WITNESSES EXPECTED TO BE CALLED AT TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED LIST OF EXHIBITS EXPECTED TO BE ADMITTED AT TRIAL

7/25/2018: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED LIST OF EXHIBITS EXPECTED TO BE ADMITTED AT TRIAL

Minute Order

7/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/6/2018: Minute Order

RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED JUDGMENT

8/6/2018: RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED JUDGMENT

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Joseph M. Kar, Esq. Re: Non-Appearance on 10/29/2018 for Oral Argument); Filed by Suman Patel M.D., Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; (Hearing-Oral Argument) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Hearing-Oral Argument)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 36; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JOSEPH M. KAR, ESQ. RE: TRIAL COURT'S ORDER OF AUGUST 6, 2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS / INCORRECT NAME)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Suman Patel M.D., Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketUNVERIFIED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR: 1. IDENTITY THEFT; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6705    Hearing Date: July 16, 2020    Dept: 36

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 36

SUMAN PATEL, MD, INC., a California Medical Corporation,

Plaintiff,

v.

JESSICA HERRERA, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****6705

Hearing Date: 2/21/2020

[TENTATIVE] RULING RE: Plaintiff’s Motion for Entry of Judgment

The motion is CONTINUED.

 

Plaintiff moves for entry of judgment against Defendants Yajaira Villanueva, Jessica Herrera, and Edgar Martinez pursuant to CCP ;; 664 and 664.6, in the matter for which trial was held on July 25, 2018. The court requests supplemental briefing from Plaintiff on:

1. Plaintiff’s service of notice of trial on all Defendants.

2. Plaintiff’s service of summons and complaint on Mr. Martinez, and whether such service was effected personally or through the correctional facility.

3. Whether a separate stipulation to judgment exists apart from the Declaration of Yajaira “Ruby” Villanueva attached as Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Joseph M. Kar.

4. Calculation of damages liability against each Defendant, including Ms. Villanueva.

5. Plaintiff’s ability to obtain entry of default against Mr. Martinez in light of Wantuch v. Davis (1995) 32 Cal.App.4th 786.

Dated: ____________________________

Gregory Alarcon

Superior Court Judge



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAR JOSEPH MICHAEL