This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 07:32:45 (UTC).

SULY CHAVEZ ET AL VS JOSE ALFREDO TORRES ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 SULY CHAVEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ALFREDO TORRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2977

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAVEZ SULY

CHAVEZ MARILIA

Defendants

DRUGS AUSTIN

TORRES JOSE ALFREDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

YADIDI P. DAVID ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON EDOR GODFREY III

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/17/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

8/17/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/17/2017: Unknown

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/15/2017: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/15/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/19/2017: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

8/21/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/27/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/27/2017: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/21/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/28/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Stipulation and Order

2/14/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/13/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Minute Order

2/1/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE

3/20/2018: NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by JOSE ALFREDO TORRES (Defendant); AUSTIN DRUGS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION); Filed by AUSTIN DRUGS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by JOSE ALFREDO TORRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by JOSE ALFREDO TORRES (Defendant); AUSTIN DRUGS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SULY CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); MARILIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2977    Hearing Date: January 21, 2020    Dept: 29

Chavez et al v. Torres et al

Plaintiff’s Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, to Tax Costs is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR to be reset for hearing in Department I of the Northwest District, Van Nuys.

This action was transferred to Department I on 9/11/19 for trial where it remains assigned. The determination of the propriety of costs involves, in part, consideration of whether any exhibits were reasonably helpful to aid the trier of fact and whether costs are reasonably necessary to the conduct of the litigation, which are issues that are properly determined by the trial court. Cal. Code Civ. Proc. ; 1033.5.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YADIDI P. DAVID ESQ.