This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2020 at 08:19:42 (UTC).

SULLIVAN, TIMOTHY ROY VS SULLIVAN, PATRICIA A

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 SULLIVAN, TIMOTHY ROY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SULLIVAN, PATRICIA A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HORAN, JAMES E.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0283

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HORAN, JAMES E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SULLIVAN TIMOTHY ROY

Respondent

SULLIVAN PATRICIA A

 

Court Documents

Witness List

4/28/2020: Witness List

Proof of Service - Mail

4/28/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Summons

2/18/2020: Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

2/18/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/18/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

2/18/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Notice - Case Assignment

2/18/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

4/9/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

4/9/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Request - Enter Default FL165

4/9/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165

Proof of Service of Summons

4/9/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

4/9/2020: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/10/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/10/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

4/10/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

Response - Domestic Violence

4/13/2020: Response - Domestic Violence

Judgment

4/16/2020: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

4/16/2020: Notice - Entry of Judgment

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 301, Horan, James E., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less