This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 05:06:57 (UTC).

SULLIVAN EQUITY PARTNERS LLC VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 SULLIVAN EQUITY PARTNERS LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT and MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9541

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SULLIVAN EQUITY PARTNERS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 25

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Intervenor and Not Classified By Court

CALIFORNIA NATIVE PLANT SOCIETY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

REZNIK BENJAMIN M. ESQ.

WALLRAFF DEAN

HINKS MATTHEW DAVID

SAMIMI SEENA

REZNIK BENJAMIN MENACHEM ESQ.

Respondent Attorneys

SEWELL CHARLES DEPUTY CITY ATTY.

SEWELL CHARLES DAVID

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

WALLRAFF DEAN

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF IMAN WILSON IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL

1/17/2018: DECLARATION OF IMAN WILSON IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL

PETITIONER SULLIVAN EQUITY PARTNERS, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO (1) COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; ETC.

1/17/2018: PETITIONER SULLIVAN EQUITY PARTNERS, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO (1) COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; ETC.

PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW D. HINKS

11/28/2017: PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW D. HINKS

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION OF JULIE CLARK DE BLASIO

12/5/2017: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION OF JULIE CLARK DE BLASIO

Minute Order

12/12/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/31/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF ELISA BETH LANDIS; ETC.

11/14/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF ELISA BETH LANDIS; ETC.

REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

5/9/2017: REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

5/15/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/17/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Proof of Service

5/22/2017: Proof of Service

STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR RESPONDENT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' RESPONSIVE PLEADING

5/24/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR RESPONDENT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' RESPONSIVE PLEADING

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

5/26/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/29/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

8/29/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

9/18/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

9/28/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

9/29/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • at 09:32 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice of Lodging (of Administrative Record); Filed by Sullivan Equity Partners LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sullivan Equity Partners LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice of Lodging (of Joint Appendix); Filed by Sullivan Equity Partners LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice of Lodging (of Non-California Authorities Appendix in Support of Opening and Reply Brief); Filed by Sullivan Equity Partners LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Reply (in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate); Filed by Sullivan Equity Partners LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Opposition (City's Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Sullivan Equity Partners LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
172 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2017
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • SUMMONS ON AMENDED PETITION AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Amended Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MAN DAMUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA NATIVE PLANT SOCIETY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLRAFF DEAN