This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2023 at 08:58:15 (UTC).

SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS FIREMAN?S FUND INSURANCE CO., AN ILLINOIS STOCK COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FIREMAN S FUND INSURANCE CO , AN ILLINOIS STOCK COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1229

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

FIREMAN?S FUND INSURANCE CO. AN ILLINOIS STOCK COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STILLMAN PHILIP H.

Defendant Attorney

SCHER GREGORY B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

8/29/2022: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/29/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice - EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT FOR: A. BREACH OF WRITTEN INSURANCE CONTRACT, B. BAD FAITH REFUSAL TO PAY INSURANCE BENEFITS, AND C. DECLARATORY RELIEF

8/19/2022: Notice - EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT FOR: A. BREACH OF WRITTEN INSURANCE CONTRACT, B. BAD FAITH REFUSAL TO PAY INSURANCE BENEFITS, AND C. DECLARATORY RELIEF

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/30/2023

1/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/30/2023

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/27/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company on 07/27/2022, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to 03/01/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department N - Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 01/30/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to 01/30/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketEXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT FOR: A. BREACH OF WRITTEN INSURANCE CONTRACT, B. BAD FAITH REFUSAL TO PAY INSURANCE BENEFITS, AND C. DECLARATORY RELIEF; Filed by: SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO., an Illinois stock company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO., an Illinois stock company (Defendant); Service Date: 08/02/2022; Service Cost: 112.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO., an Illinois stock company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO., an Illinois stock company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SUGAR FACTORY CENTURY CITY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO., an Illinois stock company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less