This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 12:55:59 (UTC).

SUEHIRO, STEVEN KEN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 SUEHIRO, STEVEN KEN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9811

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SUEHIRO AMY F.

YAMAMOTO JULIA AI

Claimant

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC

Decedent

SUEHIRO STEVEN KEN

Not Classified By Court

MCGREW DONALD L.

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

PERSOFF DAN

EVERETT NICHOLAS G.

 

Court Documents

Notice - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Summons and Contest and Grounds of Objection to Probate of Purported Will

6/8/2021: Notice - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Summons and Contest and Grounds of Objection to Probate of Purported Will

Creditor's Claim

5/3/2021: Creditor's Claim

Summons

4/14/2021: Summons

Contest of Will - Will Contest

4/14/2021: Contest of Will - Will Contest

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

4/16/2021: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent)

3/10/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent)

Declaration

3/10/2021: Declaration

Proof - Holographic Instrument

3/10/2021: Proof - Holographic Instrument

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

3/15/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

3/23/2021: Proof of Publication

Petition - Removal - PETITION FOR REMOVAL AS ADMINISTRATOR; FRAUD; AND DAMAGES

3/29/2021: Petition - Removal - PETITION FOR REMOVAL AS ADMINISTRATOR; FRAUD; AND DAMAGES

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Order - Probate

1/19/2021: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - Order - Probate

Order - Probate

1/21/2021: Order - Probate

Will in Safekeeping - Holo 1 pg - Dated - 03/07/2020 - 21STSK00372

2/19/2021: Will in Safekeeping - Holo 1 pg - Dated - 03/07/2020 - 21STSK00372

Minute Order

12/30/2020: Minute Order

Supplement - Clear Probate notes

12/28/2020: Supplement - Clear Probate notes

Proof of Publication

12/4/2020: Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

11/30/2020: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Hearing09/02/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Contest of Will Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Hearing09/02/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Hearing08/18/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Petition Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Summons and Contest and Grounds of Objection to Probate of Purported Will ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSupplement (Clear Probate notes ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERSOFF DAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVERETT, NICHOLAS G.